Global Patent Index - EP 0936586 A3

EP 0936586 A3 2001-04-18 - Self-service terminal

Title (en)

Self-service terminal

Title (de)

Selbstbedienungs-Datenstation

Title (fr)

Terminal de libre service

Publication

EP 0936586 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100454 A

Priority

DE 19806027 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936586A2] The base and support of the entire data station is a distortion-proof support plate (10) of 5 mm strong refined steel. A section in the plate has a glass plate (12) embedded flush in the plate. The square housing (14) is located behind the plate. The plate juts over the edge of the housing by at least half the depth of the housing on all sides. Behind the glass plate is a display unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936586 A2 19990818; EP 0936586 A3 20010418; DE 19806027 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-05-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07F 19/00 A

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010712

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF GMBH & CO KG

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI