Global Patent Index - EP 0936645 A3

EP 0936645 A3 2000-05-31 - Apparatus with at least one sensor switch

Title (en)

Apparatus with at least one sensor switch

Title (de)

Vorrichtung mit mindestens einem Sensorschalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif avec au moins un commutateur-capteur

Publication

EP 0936645 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101668 A

Priority

DE 19805301 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936645A2] The sensor used in a push button switch that has an input in the form of a spring strip (16) with a curved section (14) that is deformed under the action of finger presence and has a snap action. The spring interacts capacitively with surfaces (18) on a base. When the finger is removed the switch turns off with an audible snap action. An Independent claim is included for an application of the sensor switch e.g. for electric cooker.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/082 (2013.01); H01H 13/702 (2013.01); H01H 2215/036 (2013.01); H01H 2223/022 (2013.01); H01H 2239/006 (2013.01); H01H 2239/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805301 A1 19990812; EP 0936645 A2 19990818; EP 0936645 A3 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI