Global Patent Index - EP 0936692 A3

EP 0936692 A3 2001-05-16 - Microstrip line to waveguide transition and use of said transition

Title (en)

Microstrip line to waveguide transition and use of said transition

Title (de)

Übergang von einer Mikrostripleitung zu einem Hohlleiter sowie Verwendung eines solchen Übergangs

Title (fr)

Transition ligne microbande à guide d' ondes et utilisation d' une telle transition

Publication

EP 0936692 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99440016 A

Priority

DE 19805911 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936692A2] A micro strip conductor (1) is formed on the metal base substrate (6) and is coupled to a monolithic integrated microwave circuit (7). A dielectric layer (3) is between the conductor and the base. The metal base is cut back to form a resonator region (2) and the conductor has a slit shaped aperture (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 5/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/107 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] DE 4441073 C1 19960118 - ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]
  • [Y] EP 0281781 A1 19880914 - SHARP KK [JP]
  • [A] US 5539361 A 19960723 - DAVIDOVITZ MARAT [US]
  • [A] US 5384558 A 19950124 - MARUHASHI KENICHI [JP]
  • [XY] STONES D I: "ANALYSIS AND DESIGN OF A NOVEL MICROSTRIP-TO-WAVEGUIDE TRANSITION/COMBINER", IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, 23 May 1994 (1994-05-23), pages 217 - 220, XP000527274, ISBN: 0-7803-1779-3
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 352 (E - 1241) 29 July 1992 (1992-07-29)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 01 30 January 1998 (1998-01-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936692 A2 19990818; EP 0936692 A3 20010516; CA 2260407 A1 19990813; DE 19805911 A1 19990819; JP H11284412 A 19991015; US 6144266 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI