Global Patent Index - EP 0936952 B1

EP 0936952 B1 2001-01-03 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR BURRING METAL PARTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR BURRING METAL PARTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ENTGRATEN VON METALLTEILEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EBARBAGE DE PIECES METALLIQUES

Publication

EP 0936952 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943780 A

Priority

  • DE 19739868 A
  • EP 9804653 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739868A1] The present invention relates to a method for burring metal parts using a high-pressure stream of liquid which is ejected from a high-pressure nozzle and is directed towards the part to be burred. The use of a high-pressure stream of liquid with an oil-content of more than 50 % at a high pressure exceeding 400 bars enables the burring process to be integrated to the process of manufacturing parts in metal-working machines currently available on the market.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/02; B23Q 11/00; B24C 1/00; F16P 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/00 (2006.01); B24C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/083 (2013.01); B24C 11/005 (2013.01); Y10S 29/007 (2013.01); Y10S 29/039 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5182 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739868 A1 19990325; AT 198432 T 20010115; EP 0936952 A1 19990825; EP 0936952 B1 20010103; ES 2154079 T3 20010316; US 6178610 B1 20010130; WO 9912665 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PILLER ENTGRATTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154079

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800421

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-08

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-01-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198432

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-09-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991210

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990920

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI