Global Patent Index - EP 0936990 B1

EP 0936990 B1 2001-03-21 - SMALL-SCALE BLISTER PACKER

Title (en)

SMALL-SCALE BLISTER PACKER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRODUZIEREN VON BLISTERPACKUNGEN IN KLEINEM MASSSTAB

Title (fr)

APPAREIL D'EMBALLAGE-COQUE A PETITE ECHELLE

Publication

EP 0936990 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97910507 A

Priority

  • GB 9702926 W
  • GB 9622931 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9819913A2] A pressing station assembly for a small-scale blister packing apparatus comprising upper and lower pressing plates, one or both of which are moveable between a rest position and a pressing position, the pressing plates securely supporting upper and lower tools respectively, wherein one or both of the tools are adapted to be secured to the or each respective pressing plate using a quick release attachment means, is described. The tool(s) are preferably attached to the pressing plate(s) using a tool attachment means, moveable between open and closed positions. Guidance means assist alignment and levelling of the tool(s). A small-scale blister packing apparatus comprising a blister roll supporting apparatus, blister roll guidance means, and a blister pack pressing station assembly as herein defined is also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/50; B65B 47/04; B65B 59/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/50 (2006.01); B65B 47/04 (2006.01); B65B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/50 (2013.01); B65B 47/04 (2013.01); B65B 59/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9819913 A2 19980514; WO 9819913 A3 19980730; AU 4786197 A 19980529; AU 733694 B2 20010524; CA 2270121 A1 19980514; DE 69704374 D1 20010426; DE 69704374 T2 20011025; EP 0936990 A2 19990825; EP 0936990 B1 20010321; ES 2158519 T3 20010901; GB 9622931 D0 19970108; JP 2001503713 A 20010321; NZ 335430 A 20000623

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161102

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081105

2010-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081104

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081104

2009-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158519 T3

2001-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704374 20010426

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991210

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990602

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE