Global Patent Index - EP 0937008 B1

EP 0937008 B1 2002-11-06 - SPOOLING MACHINE

Title (en)

SPOOLING MACHINE

Title (de)

AUFSPULMASCHINE

Title (fr)

BOBINEUSE

Publication

EP 0937008 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951310 A

Priority

  • DE 19739844 A
  • EP 9805341 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912837A1] The invention relates to a spooling machine for winding a continuously supplied thread (1) into a spool (15). Said spool is formed on a core (19), said core being clamped on one of two spool spindles (17, 18). The spool spindles are mounted on a spool revolver (20) in such a way that they protrude and can turn. The inventive spooling machine also has a thread redirecting device (21) so that the thread can be transferred from a full spool which is clamped on one of the spool spindles to an empty core which is clamped on the other spool spindle by means of the spool revolver turning, said thread redirecting device being moved around from a rest position (27) to a redirecting position (28). The redirecting position is determined by a stop (29) which is placed on the spool revolver. As the spool revolver turns, the redirecting position changes correspondingly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 65/00; B65H 67/048

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/00 (2006.01); B65H 67/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/00 (2013.01); B65H 67/048 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912837 A1 19990318; CN 1163395 C 20040825; CN 1237143 A 19991201; EP 0937008 A1 19990825; EP 0937008 B1 20021106; KR 100531232 B1 20051125; KR 20000068901 A 20001125; TW 383291 B 20000301; US 6070827 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806184

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806184

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100821

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HERMANN KAHLHOEFER

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806184 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020123

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990514

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI