Global Patent Index - EP 0937127 A4

EP 0937127 A4 2001-01-31 - GLYCERINE PERSONAL CLEANSING BAR WITH ALKYL POLYGLUCOSIDE

Title (en)

GLYCERINE PERSONAL CLEANSING BAR WITH ALKYL POLYGLUCOSIDE

Title (de)

GLYCENINHALTIGES REINIGUNGSMITTELSTÜCK ENTHALTEND ALKYLPOLYGLYKOSID

Title (fr)

PAIN NETTOYANT GLYCERINE D'HYGIENE PERSONNELLE, CONTENANT UN POLYGLUCOSIDE ALKYLIQUE

Publication

EP 0937127 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97946301 A

Priority

  • US 9719314 W
  • US 74700396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9820097A1] A personal cleansing composition containing: (a) an alkyl polyglycoside of the formula (I): R1O(R2O)b(Z)a, wherein R1 is a monovalent organic radical having from about 6 to about 30 carbon atoms; R2 is a divalent alkylene radical having from 2 to 4 carbon atoms; Z is a saccharide residue having 5 or 6 carbon atoms; b is a number having a value from 0 to about 12; a is a number having a value from 1 to about 6; (b) glycerin; (c) soap; and (d) water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/22; C11D 9/00; C11D 13/00; C11D 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 10/04 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 10/045 (2013.01); C11D 3/2065 (2013.01); C11D 17/006 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9511959 A1 19950504 - HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al
  • [X] DE 4114491 A1 19921105 - HENKEL KGAA [DE]
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199151, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D21, AN 1991-372784, XP002154855
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198605, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A97, AN 1986-032051, XP002154856
  • See also references of WO 9820097A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9820097 A1 19980514; AR 009409 A1 20000412; BR 9712752 A 19991019; EP 0937127 A1 19990825; EP 0937127 A4 20010131; PE 39099 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010409

2001-01-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-11-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WHITE, J., MATTHEW

1999-11-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GREEN, TINA, M.

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL CORPORATION

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990416

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL