Global Patent Index - EP 0937186 B1

EP 0937186 B1 2002-11-13 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTING A MORTISE LOCK WITH A CLOSING CYLINDER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PROTECTING A MORTISE LOCK WITH A CLOSING CYLINDER

Title (de)

SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN EINSTECKSCHLOSS MIT SCHLIESSZYLINDER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION D'UNE SERRURE A MORTAISE AVEC UN CYLINDRE DE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 0937186 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97943714 A

Priority

  • CH 9700393 W
  • CH 272396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9820217A1] A device for protecting a mortise lock (1) with a closing cylinder (4) has an outer breach-proof cover (6) which encloses the projecting end of the closing cylinder (4) at the outer side of the door (2). The outer cover (6) is slipped on a sliding plate (7) joined to a holding plate (8) that protects the mortise lock (1) against breaches by drilling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/20; E05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/06 (2006.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/2084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29620879 U1 19970123; AT 227798 T 20021115; AU 4547897 A 19980529; BR 9712873 A 19991207; CZ 9900739 A3 19990616; DE 59708734 D1 20021219; EP 0937186 A1 19990825; EP 0937186 B1 20021113; HU 0000190 A2 20000828; HU 0000190 A3 20010730; PL 185331 B1 20030430; PL 333185 A1 19991122; SK 58799 A3 20000214; WO 9820217 A1 19980514

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061021

2005-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050908

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050817

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KELLER ERNST

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0937186E

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-02-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708734 20021219

2002-12-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990416

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227798 T 20021115

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991203

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990416

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990416