Global Patent Index - EP 0937189 B1

EP 0937189 B1 2001-03-28 - COUPLING PART

Title (en)

COUPLING PART

Title (de)

KUPPLUNGSSTÜCK

Title (fr)

PIECE D'ACCOUPLEMENT

Publication

EP 0937189 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97948812 A

Priority

  • DE 19645602 A
  • EP 9705926 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19645602A1] The invention concerns a coupling device (3) for the operational connection of crank handles to drive devices for awning drums. The coupling device (3) comprises a part (11) which is in the form of a hollow body and internally has at least one recess, and into which a head, preferably a spherical head (17), which is or can be connected to the crank handle shaft, can be inserted with a corresponding projection engaging in the recess.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/76 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19645602 A1 19980507; AT 200136 T 20010415; AU 7002698 A 19980529; DK 0937189 T3 20010521; EP 0937189 A1 19990825; EP 0937189 B1 20010328; SI 9720068 A 19991031; SK 61299 A3 20000410; WO 9820227 A1 19980514

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051027

2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-06-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2002-05-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020503

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011027

2001-10-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011027

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-08-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703248 20010503

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FELBER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES IT LI

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200136 T 20010415

2000-11-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000828

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990607

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES IT LI