Global Patent Index - EP 0937218 B1

EP 0937218 B1 2000-09-27 - METHOD APPLICABLE TO A CONTINUOUS STEAM GENERATOR, AND THE STEAM GENERATOR NEEDED FOR APPLYING SAME

Title (en)

METHOD APPLICABLE TO A CONTINUOUS STEAM GENERATOR, AND THE STEAM GENERATOR NEEDED FOR APPLYING SAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES DURCHLAUFDAMPFERZEUGERS UND DURCHLAUFDAMPFERZEUGER ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE APPLICABLE AVEC UN GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR EN CONTINU, ET LE GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR NECESSAIRE A L'APPLICATION DE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0937218 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97945787 A

Priority

  • DE 9702479 W
  • DE 19645748 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19645748C1] The steam generator operating method has a flow medium fed through vertical pipes enclosing a combustion chamber, with the mass flow-rate (m) of the flow medium defined by a given equation in terms of the outer dia. of the pipes, their wall thickness, the permissible max. temp. of the pipe material and the heat flow density (q). Pref. the max. permissible temp. is calculated from a given equation in terms of the critical temp.corresponding to the temp. of the flow medium at a critical pressure, the permissible stress, the thermic expansion coefficient and the elasticity modulus of the pipe material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 37/10; F22B 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 35/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); F22B 21/06 (2006.01); F22B 29/06 (2006.01); F22B 35/10 (2006.01); F22B 37/04 (2006.01); F22B 37/10 (2006.01); F22B 37/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 29/062 (2013.01); F22B 37/103 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19645748 C1 19980312; CA 2270596 A1 19980514; CN 1240020 A 19991229; DK 0937218 T3 20010205; EP 0937218 A1 19990825; EP 0937218 B1 20000927; ES 2151295 T3 20001216; JP 2001503505 A 20010313; KR 20000053090 A 20000825; RU 2181179 C2 20020410; US 6250257 B1 20010626; WO 9820280 A1 19980514

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-06-16 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-06-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20021024

2003-06-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-10-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-10-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-01-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020110

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011217

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011024

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011018

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011016

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011016

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ALSTOM POWER BOILER GMBH

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-02-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151295

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702415

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-02

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990819

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990422

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE