Global patent index - EP 0937416 A3

EP 0937416 A3 2000-05-31 - System for regulating the internal size of an helmet

Title (en)

System for regulating the internal size of an helmet

Title (de)

Helm mit Vorrichtung zur Anpassung an unterschiedlichen Kopfgrössen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour ajuster la taille interne d'un casque

Publication

EP 0937416 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99100614 A

Priority

IT TO980029 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937416A2] The invention concerns a system for regulating the internal dimension of an helmet (1) provided with a strap (2) arranged along at least a portion of a circumference laying on a plane substantially transversal to a user's head when the helmet is worn, restraining and guiding means (5,6a-6d,7a,7b) for said strap (2) along said circumference, a couple of tie rods (10a, 10b) whose length can be varied by means of a tightening device suitable for tightening or releasing said strap (2) varying therefore the area of the surface defined within said circumference. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937416 A2 19990825; EP 0937416 A3 20000531; IT 245798 Y1 20020326; IT TO980029 U1 19990818

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040417

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAMAU SYSTEM DI CASALE & C.S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SYSTEM FOR REGULATING THE INTERNAL SIZE OF A HELMET

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021030

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI