Global patent index - EP 0937424 A3

EP 0937424 A3 2000-01-05 - Brush for nail varnish or the like

Title (en)

Brush for nail varnish or the like

Title (de)

Pinsel für Nagellack oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Pinceau pour appliquer du vernis à ongles, ou un produit analogue

Publication

EP 0937424 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99201160 A

Priority

  • EP 94402403 A
  • FR 9313214 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0651955A1] The brush (1) for application of nail varnish or similar product includes bristles (3, 4) forming a tuft (2) which is obtained from a bundle of substantially parallel bristles folded in two halfway along their length, the bristles being fastened to the end of a wand (5) by engagement, with gripping, of the folded part (8) of the tuft of bristles in a housing (9) opening up at the end of the wand. The bristles (3, 4) have sections accepting a circumscribed circle of constant diameter and are chosen from at least two groups, the bristles (3) of one group being arranged so as to have a mechanical behaviour on flexing which is different from that of the bristles (4) of the other group so that, during folding and gripping of the different groups of bristles, these groups give a ventilated and spread-out brush tuft (2), with relatively large spaces between bristles which favour good capillarity for varnishes, the viscosity of which may vary over a wide range. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/06; A46B 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 29/18 (2006.01); A45D 29/00 (2006.01); A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A46B 3/16 (2006.01); A46B 9/02 (2006.01); A46B 9/06 (2006.01); A46D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 3/16 (2013.01); A46B 9/06 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1046 (2013.01); Y10S 15/05 (2013.01); Y10S 15/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0651955 A1 19950510; EP 0651955 B1 20010117; CA 2134734 A1 19950506; CA 2134734 C 19990202; DE 69426591 D1 20010222; DE 69426591 T2 20010531; DE 69430220 D1 20020425; DE 69430220 T2 20020718; DE 69430220 T3 20060803; EP 0937424 A2 19990825; EP 0937424 A3 20000105; EP 0937424 B1 20020320; EP 0937424 B2 20060111; ES 2153411 T3 20010301; ES 2171065 T3 20020816; ES 2171065 T5 20060501; FR 2711898 A1 19950512; FR 2711898 B1 19951229; JP 2977452 B2 19991115; JP H07184716 A 19950725; JP H10295440 A 19981110; US 5588447 A 19961231

INPADOC legal status

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081026

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081026

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081026

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071009

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061019

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2006-02-01 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2006-01-11 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-10-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051010

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-02-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GEKA BRUSH GMBH

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2171065

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69430220

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-03-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 651955

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990413

1999-08-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 651955

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT