Global Patent Index - EP 0937428 A3

EP 0937428 A3 2001-02-07 - Slatted bed-base

Title (en)

Slatted bed-base

Title (de)

Lattenrost für Liegemöbel

Title (fr)

Sommier à lattes

Publication

EP 0937428 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102059 A

Priority

CH 32698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937428A2] The frame has at least two longitudinal spaced-apart supports (1) and a number of transverse sprung slats (3), supported by spring elements (2). The contact point (5) between the spring elements and the sprung slats is staggered inwards in relation to the ends (4) of the sprung slats and towards the longitudinal center (6) of the frame. The sprung slats are secured so that they do not shift in relation to the sprung elements, by a pin (10) wedging into a sleeve-shaped cavity (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/064 (2013.01); A47C 23/06 (2013.01); A47C 23/062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937428 A2 19990825; EP 0937428 A3 20010207

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-11-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI