Global patent index - EP 0937430 A3

EP 0937430 A3 2000-03-01 - Display stand

Title (en)

Display stand

Title (de)

Präsentationseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Présentoir

Publication

EP 0937430 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102277 A

Priority

DE 19805420 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937430A2] The display device has a shelf (2) with several horizontally movable support plates set one above the other to support products at different heights. A platform (3) can move up and down next to the shelf and has a device to gripping a support plate and move it up and under the platform into a display position or back again into the shelf. The platform is moved up and down by a drive and the device for moving the support plate has its own drive and the drives are controlled by a manually operable control device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/00 (2006.01); A47F 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 11/10 (2013.01); A47F 7/0042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805420 A1 19990819; DE 19805420 C2 20000217; EP 0937430 A2 19990825; EP 0937430 A3 20000301; US 6216890 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-09-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020614

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI