Global Patent Index - EP 0937505 B1

EP 0937505 B1 2002-09-11 - Packaging and dispensing unit and use of such a unit for packaging cosmetical, pharmaceutical or dermopharmaceutical products

Title (en)

Packaging and dispensing unit and use of such a unit for packaging cosmetical, pharmaceutical or dermopharmaceutical products

Title (de)

Verpackungs- und Abgabeeinheit und Verwendung einer solchen Einheit zur Verpackung von kosmetischen, pharmazeutischen oder dermopharmazeutischen Produkten

Title (fr)

Ensemble de conditionnement et de distribution, et utilisation d'un tel ensemble pour le conditionnement d'un produit cosmétique, pharmaceutique ou dermopharmaceutique

Publication

EP 0937505 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98403324 A

Priority

FR 9802205 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937505A1] The container and dispenser comprises a replaceable container (20) for the product to be dispensed. It is made with a top opening and designed to fit inside a shell (2) containing a pump and an actuator (17) with an outlet nozzle (18). The container is inserted through an aperture in the base of the shell (4), the lower edge of which has one or more recesses (33) to facilitate removal of the container for replacement. The container is held in place by elastically deformable vanes inside the shell which grip its neck.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/0037 (2013.01); B05B 11/0054 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937505 A1 19990825; EP 0937505 B1 20020911; DE 69807838 D1 20021017; DE 69807838 T2 20030116; DE 69827675 D1 20041223; DE 69827675 T2 20051006; EP 1136136 A2 20010926; EP 1136136 A3 20020828; EP 1136136 B1 20041117; ES 2183305 T3 20030316; ES 2232575 T3 20050601; FR 2775258 A1 19990827; FR 2775258 B1 20000512; US 6053363 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180102

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183305 T3

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807838 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-05-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990929

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI