Global Patent Index - EP 0937518 A3

EP 0937518 A3 2002-11-27 - Rolling method for at least a first and a second rolled strand

Title (en)

Rolling method for at least a first and a second rolled strand

Title (de)

Walzverfahren für mindestens eine erste und eine zweite Walzader

Title (fr)

Procédé de laminage pour au moins un premier et un deuxième brin laminé

Publication

EP 0937518 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103085 A

Priority

DE 19807559 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937518A2] Prior to known events leading to a change in the rolling velocity, the length of the loop (8) of the rolling strands (1, 2) is adjusted to a value which is optimized for these events.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/50; B21B 41/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/18 (2006.01); B21B 37/00 (2006.01); B21B 37/50 (2006.01); B21B 41/12 (2006.01); G05B 13/02 (2006.01); B21B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/50 (2013.01); B21B 41/12 (2013.01); B21B 1/18 (2013.01); B21B 2013/006 (2013.01); B21B 2273/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 034 (M - 357) 14 February 1985 (1985-02-14)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 194 (M - 403) 10 August 1985 (1985-08-10)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 235 (M - 415) 21 September 1985 (1985-09-21)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937518 A2 19990825; EP 0937518 A3 20021127; DE 19807559 A1 19990826; JP H11314108 A 19991116; US 6128938 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040721

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990217

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI