Global patent index - EP 0937521 A3

EP 0937521 A3 2001-01-31 - Method and machine for straithtening metal strips

Title (en)

Method and machine for straithtening metal strips

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Richten von Metallbändern und Richtmaschine hierzu

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de planage de bandes métalliques

Publication

EP 0937521 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124099 A

Priority

DE 19806668 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937521A2] For straightening of metal strips with variable thickness, the straightening rolls (14) in at least one roll frame (12) are controlled so that their distances from their associated straightening rolls (13) in the other roll frame (11) is altered dependent on the strip thickness variation. The claimed apparatus in the form of a strip straightening machine a) preferably the top roll frame (12) is designed so that it can execute a pendulum motion altering the distance between the successive roll pairs (13, 14); b) the pendulum drive (25) is provided with a control unit (26) which controls it according to a program specifying a pendulum motion of the roll frame (12) dependent on the thickness variation of the strip to be straightened.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5255548 A 19931026 - MELZER ANDREW E [US], et al
  • [A] DE 2424876 A1 19751127 - PHYSITRONIK GERAETEBAU GMBH
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 067 (M - 673) 2 March 1988 (1988-03-02)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 036 (M - 664) 3 February 1988 (1988-02-03)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19806668 A1 19990819; EP 0937521 A2 19990825; EP 0937521 A3 20010131; ZA 9901242 B 20000817

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030424

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI