Global Patent Index - EP 0937538 B1

EP 0937538 B1 2003-06-18 - Low profile pneumatic retractor clamp

Title (en)

Low profile pneumatic retractor clamp

Title (de)

Einschiebbare pneumatische Flachprofilspannvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pneumatique de bridage rétractable à profil bas

Publication

EP 0937538 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98301256 A

Priority

EP 98301256 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937538A1] A low profile fixture clamp (10) which provides a clamping force in two perpendicular directions through the motion of a pneumatic cylinder (20) in a single plane. The principle component of the clamping force is a horizontal force in-line with the force generated by the pneumatic air cylinder. An additionally vertical downward clamping force is also generated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23Q 3/06; B25B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01); B25B 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/087 (2013.01); B25B 5/064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937538 A1 19990825; EP 0937538 B1 20030618; DE 69815653 D1 20030724; DE 69815653 T2 20040603

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050218

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040218

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815653 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELAWARE CAPITAL FORMATION, INC.

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELAWARE CAPITAL FORMATION, INC.

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020412

2000-05-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI