Global Patent Index - EP 0937540 A3

EP 0937540 A3 2000-05-24 - Sanding-polishing machine for slabs, tiles and the like

Title (en)

Sanding-polishing machine for slabs, tiles and the like

Title (de)

Bims-Poliermaschine für Fliesen, Platten und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Machine de ponçage-polissage pour plaques, carreaux ou similaire

Publication

EP 0937540 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99830085 A

Priority

IT MO980039 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937540A2] The invention relates to a sander-polisher machine for slabs, tiles and the like, which comprises a mobile plane (1) for the slabs or tiles (2) conveying the latter in a predetermined direction. Above the mobile plane (1) are located a plurality of rotating frontally-acting sanders (3) having rotation axes which are perpendicular to the mobile plane (1) and to the advancement direction of the tiles (2). The frontally-acting sanders (3) are located above the mobile plane (1) and operate contactingly with at least a part of the upper surface (20) of at least one tile (2) situated on the mobile plane (1) in such a way that the upper surface (20) is entirely covered by a sanding action of the frontally-acting sanders (3) acting in a perpendicular direction to the advancement direction of the tiles (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 7/22; B24B 7/06; B24B 29/00; B24B 41/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/06 (2006.01); B24B 7/22 (2006.01); B24B 41/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/22 (2013.01); B24B 7/06 (2013.01); B24B 41/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937540 A2 19990825; EP 0937540 A3 20000524; IT 1305459 B1 20010509; IT MO980039 A1 19990824

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001125

2001-03-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 24B 7/22 A, 7B 24B 7/06 B, 7B 24B 41/047 B, 7B 24B 29/00 B

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI