Global Patent Index - EP 0937682 B1

EP 0937682 B1 2001-12-12 - Aluminosilicate organic inorganic polymer

Title (en)

Aluminosilicate organic inorganic polymer

Title (de)

Organisch-anorganisches Polymer aus Aluminosilikat

Title (fr)

Polymère organique-inorganique d' aluminosilicate

Publication

EP 0937682 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99420043 A

Priority

FR 9802364 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937682A1] An organic-inorganic polymer comprising aluminosilicate having grafted thereon an organic radical having a -SH or -S(-CH2)n-S- group wherein n is from 0 to 4. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C01B 33/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 20/02 (2006.01); C01B 33/26 (2006.01); C01B 33/44 (2006.01); C02F 1/28 (2006.01); C02F 1/56 (2006.01); C08G 77/28 (2006.01); G03C 5/00 (2006.01); G03C 5/395 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/56 (2013.01); C01B 33/26 (2013.01); C01B 33/44 (2013.01); C02F 1/285 (2013.01); G03C 5/395 (2013.01); C02F 2103/40 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2962 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2995 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937682 A1 19990825; EP 0937682 B1 20011212; DE 69900563 D1 20020124; DE 69900563 T2 20020801; FR 2775277 A1 19990827; FR 2775277 B1 20000428; JP H11315143 A 19991116; US 6179898 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060109

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070218

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070218

2006-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060202

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900563 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-08-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

2000-05-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000122

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI