Global Patent Index - EP 0937726 A4

EP 0937726 A4 2001-04-11 - INTERMEDIATES FOR THE PREPARATION OF DUOCARMYCIN SA AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF, AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE INTERMEDIATES

Title (en)

INTERMEDIATES FOR THE PREPARATION OF DUOCARMYCIN SA AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF, AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE INTERMEDIATES

Title (de)

ZWISCHENPRODUKTE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DUOCARMYCIN-SA UND DERIVATEN DAVON, SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ZWISCHENPRODUKTE

Title (fr)

PRODUITS INTERMEDIAIRES DESTINES A LA PREPARATION DE DUOCARMYCINE SA ET DE DERIVES DE CE DERNIER, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CES PRODUITS INTERMEDIAIRES

Publication

EP 0937726 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97928473 A

Priority

  • JP 9702207 W
  • JP 24609796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937726A1] Indole derivatives shown by the formulae (1), (2a) and (2b) <CHEM> (wherein R<1> is a protecting group for amino group; R<2> is a protecting group for hydroxyl group; R<3> is a protecting group for hydroxyl group; R<4> is a C1-C6 linear or branched lower alkyl group, or benzyl group), and pyrroloindole derivatives shown by formula (3) <CHEM> (wherein R<1> is a protecting group for amino group; R<2> is a protecting group for hydroxyl group; R<3> is a protecting group for hydroxyl group; R<4> is a C1-C6 linear or branched lower alkyl group, or benzyl group), both of which are intermediates for duocarmycin SA, which is expected to be used as an anticancer agent, and derivatives thereof; and a method for producing the same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 487/04; A61K 31/40; C07D 209/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/403 (2006.01); A61K 31/404 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 209/12 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 487/04 (2013.01); C07D 209/12 (2013.01); Y02P 20/55 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9404534 A1 19940303 - KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP], et al
  • [A] WO 9116324 A1 19911031 - UPJOHN CO [US]
  • [X] BOGER D L ET AL: "TOTAL SYNTHESIS AND PRELIMINARY EVVALUATION OF (+)- AND ENT-(-)- DUOCARMYCIN SA", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, vol. 115, no. 20, 1993, pages 9025 - 9036, XP002914132, ISSN: 0002-7863
  • [X] JAMART-GREGOIRE B ET AL: "Aggregative Activation and Heterocyclic Chemistry IINucleophilic condensations of ketone enolates on dehydrodihydropyran generated by Complex Bases", TETRAHEDRON,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, vol. 51, no. 7, 13 February 1995 (1995-02-13), pages 1973 - 1984, XP004104829, ISSN: 0040-4020
  • [X] QUELET ET AL.: "Sur la synthèse des indoles alpha-substitués", C. R. HEBD. SCIENCES ACAD. SCI., vol. 249, 1959, pages 1526 - 1528, XP000983503
  • See also references of WO 9812197A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937726 A1 19990825; EP 0937726 A4 20010411; EP 0937726 B1 20030312; AT 234304 T 20030315; AU 3274997 A 19980414; CA 2266505 A1 19980326; CN 1090632 C 20020911; CN 1230960 A 19991006; DE 69719781 D1 20030417; JP H1087666 A 19980407; KR 20000036211 A 20000626; US 6066742 A 20000523; WO 9812197 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2004-02-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030626

2004-02-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030613

2003-06-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69719781 P 20030417

2003-04-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGAMI CHEMICAL RESEARCH CENTER

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010712

2001-04-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990416

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE