Global patent index - EP 0937802 A3

EP 0937802 A3 2000-07-12 - Spool carrier for braiding machine

Title (en)

Spool carrier for braiding machine

Title (de)

Spulenträger einer Flechtmaschine

Title (fr)

Porte-bobine pour métier à tresser

Publication

EP 0937802 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103421 A

Priority

DE 19807773 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937802A2] The yarn guides (16,17,18) have a body of spring steel wire and make a snap connection with a recessed reinforcement (19,20) on the plastic upper part (7) of the bobbin carrier. The guide can be additionally secured e.g. with a screw.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04C 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04C 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04C 3/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937802 A2 19990825; EP 0937802 A3 20000712; DE 19807773 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021031

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI