Global Patent Index - EP 0937805 A3

EP 0937805 A3 2000-06-07 - Device for extracting liquid from textile fabrics

Title (en)

Device for extracting liquid from textile fabrics

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Entfeuchten von textilen Warenbahnen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l' essorage des étoffes textiles

Publication

EP 0937805 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101182 A

Priority

DE 19807391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807391C1] Textile fabric (W) is dried by passing it over a suction slot (25) formed between a slide bar (20) and a roller (30). The roller (30) runs in a concave recess (14) in the slide bar (20) and has a sliding seal (21) where it meets the suction box (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 15/04 (2006.01); F26B 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 15/04 (2013.01); F26B 13/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] GB 1545204 A 19790502 - SPOONER IND LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807391 C1 19990506; EP 0937805 A2 19990825; EP 0937805 A3 20000607; US 6079117 A 20000627

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI