Global Patent Index - EP 0937806 A3

EP 0937806 A3 2000-05-24 - Device for continuously passing a treating gas through a textile material or the like

Title (en)

Device for continuously passing a treating gas through a textile material or the like

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum durchströmenden, kontinuierlichen Behandeln von Textilgut o. dgl.

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faire passer en continu un gaz de traitement à travers une matière textile ou analogue

Publication

EP 0937806 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103271 A

Priority

DE 19806614 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937806A2] The suction drum, to draw a gas continuously through a web material passing round its circumference, has a perforated drum mantle and end sides (11, 12) under suction. Plate strips (13), between both end sides of the drum, are rigidly in place along their whole radial height held in place by release mountings at the drum ends. A clamp (19-22) mounting holds the plate strips at the drum ends. A radial clamping groove (19) at the drum end has an opening cross section equal to the gap between two adjacent plate strips. The groove has a conical taper towards the drum ends, and towards the end (13') of the plate strips to form clamping pads (20, 21). A clamping pin (22) is between the two strips within the groove, with side cheeks matching the pitch angle of the clamping pads of the groove. The pin width has the dimensions of the groove with the inserted strip thickness. The pin is held in place with one and pref. two bolts (23, 24) at the drum ends. The axially oriented ends of the strips are held over their whole surface areas between the clamping pads of the groove and the side cheeks of the clamping pins. The clamping grooves are at a centering ring (17) unit, held by bolts at the drum ends. The centering ring mounting bolts are between the ring and the drum end each behind a clamping groove, in the peripheral direction and between two grooves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 23/02; D21F 5/18; F26B 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 23/02 (2006.01); D21F 5/18 (2006.01); F26B 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/16 (2013.01); D06B 23/025 (2013.01); D21F 5/182 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 3821330 A1 19891228 - FLEISSNER MASCHF AG [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19806614 A1 19990819; EP 0937806 A2 19990825; EP 0937806 A3 20000524; EP 0937806 B1 20030507; US 6088927 A 20000718

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100213

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090213

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090213

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905386 P 20030612

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020611

2001-03-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI