Global Patent Index - EP 0937819 A3

EP 0937819 A3 2000-08-16 - Access means

Title (en)

Access means

Title (de)

Zugangsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'accès

Publication

EP 0937819 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300391 A

Priority

GB 9801096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2333311A] A ramped access for the crossing of an obstacle whereby the ramp is made up of discrete ramp elements 17 connected by connecting means C1 and C3 so that a load is partially supported on the ramp. This is to ensure that damage of the rail 10 or pipes, in another embodiment of the invention, does not occur. Also included is a bridge member 40 connecting the transversely opposite ramp elements 17. The length of this bridge is depicted by the size of the obstacle. A flexible mat is also included which is made up metal chains and interlinked closed loops, which enables passage of the load over uneven or boggy ground. A shield member made up of a channel section can also be adapted so that the ramped access can be mounted onto a railway line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 9/04; B61K 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61K 5/04 (2006.01); E01C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61K 5/04 (2013.01); E01C 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2333311 A 19990721; GB 2333311 B 20020925; GB 9901130 D0 19990310; EP 0937819 A2 19990825; EP 0937819 A3 20000816; GB 9801096 D0 19980318

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051111

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI