Global Patent Index - EP 0937828 A3

EP 0937828 A3 2000-01-19 - Sanitary fitting with pipe connection element

Title (en)

Sanitary fitting with pipe connection element

Title (de)

Wasserarmatur mit Rohranschlussverbindung

Title (fr)

Robinetterie sanitaire avec raccord de tuyauterie

Publication

EP 0937828 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102272 A

Priority

DE 19807200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937828A2] A tap, especially a single hole mixer unit for rinsing surfaces, comprises a connection opening (11) for the water supply and at least one housing (1) with an outlet. The tap has a metal pipe (2) connection with an O-ring (4) seal. Each connection opening has an annular groove (12) and one or more pockets with support shoulders. A clip ring acts as an axial safety element and is located on the pipe. The end face has one or more radial tongues (32) which carry a radial projection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/0403 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937828 A2 19990825; EP 0937828 A3 20000119; DE 19807200 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROHE WATER TECHNOLOGY AG & CO. KG

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030321

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000701

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRIEDRICH GROHE AG & CO. KG

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI