Global Patent Index - EP 0937838 A3

EP 0937838 A3 2000-05-03 - System and method for laying shingles

Title (en)

System and method for laying shingles

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zum Verlegen von Schindeln

Title (fr)

Système et procédé pour la pose de bardeaux

Publication

EP 0937838 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300449 A

Priority

IL 12301898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937838A2] A system (10) is provided for laying shingles (19), which includes (a) a plurality of batten elements (12); and (b) a plurality of rafter elements (16) to which are connected articles (14) provided with substantially evenly spaced connecting regions (18) shaped and designed for evenly spacing and for substantially perpendicularly connecting the plurality of batten elements (12) to the rafter elements (16) such that the plurality of batten elements becomes adapted for supporting shingles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 12/00; E04B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/02 (2006.01); E04D 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/024 (2013.01); E04D 12/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937838 A2 19990825; EP 0937838 A3 20000503; AU 1216799 A 19990812; IL 123018 D0 19980924; ZA 9900427 B 19990721

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-02-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI