Global Patent Index - EP 0937846 A3

EP 0937846 A3 2001-04-04 - Mortise lock

Title (en)

Mortise lock

Title (de)

Einsteckschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure à mortaise

Publication

EP 0937846 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102912 A

Priority

DE 29802906 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937846A2] The lock has a support part (1) spacing a lock box base in relation to a lock cover (4). The support part has a middle part determining the distance between the lock box base and the lock cover, together with end parts (17) which extend through break-throughs formed in the lock box base and the lock cover. The height of the support part together with the height of the middle part produces a total height, which corresponds to the width of the lock pocket. At least one lock pocket support (30) has a height corresponding to the width of the lock pocket and is externally fixed to the side wall of the lock box (3) located in the vicinity of the closure area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 63/08; E05B 9/02; E05B 59/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/02 (2006.01); E05B 63/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/08 (2013.01); E05B 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802906 U1 19980402; AT 265598 T 20040515; CZ 8519 U1 19990616; DK 0937846 T3 20040726; EP 0937846 A2 19990825; EP 0937846 A3 20010404; EP 0937846 B1 20040428; NO 990494 A 19990820; NO 990494 D0 19990203; PL 190373 B1 20051230; PL 331555 A1 19990830

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909274

- Effective date: 20130903

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120312

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080212

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080213

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080212

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080212

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080212

2008-10-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-09-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-02-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-08-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909274 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FI GB NL SE

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAECHSISCHE SCHLOSSFABRIK GMBH

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE DK FI GB NL SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 63/08 A, 7E 05B 9/02 B, 7E 05B 59/02 B

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FI GB NL SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI