Global patent index - EP 0937848 A3

EP 0937848 A3 2000-06-07 - Espagnolette lock, particularly for doors of caravans, mobile homes or the like

Title (en)

Espagnolette lock, particularly for doors of caravans, mobile homes or the like

Title (de)

Treibstangenverschluss, insbesondere für Türen von Wohnwagen, Wohnmobilen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Serrure à crémone, notamment pour portes de caravanes, mobilhomes ou similaires

Publication

EP 0937848 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103167 A

Priority

DE 19807383 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937848A2] The driving rods are displaced by an operating handle against spring loading in an opening direction and are synchronously driven in contrary directions. A spring force accumulator (17) is positioned between the driving rods and is held by a blocking element in the form of a two-armed lever. The driving rods are guided in a C-shaped groove open on the outside, in the door frame. Drive pieces (15,16) for the driving rods lead through longitudinal slots in the door frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/04; E05B 63/20; E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/20 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/20 (2013.01); E05C 9/042 (2013.01); E05C 9/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937848 A2 19990825; EP 0937848 A3 20000607; DE 19906789 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030902

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI