Global Patent Index - EP 0937849 A3

EP 0937849 A3 2000-04-19 - Elongated arresting device comprising a braking sleeve with limited movement

Title (en)

Elongated arresting device comprising a braking sleeve with limited movement

Title (de)

Langgestreckte Fangeinrichtung mit begrenzt beweglichem Bremsmantelstück

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'arrêt allongé comportant un manchon de freinage avec mouvement limité

Publication

EP 0937849 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103414 A

Priority

DE 19807260 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937849A2] The elongated box-shaped profile (20) has a tapering orifice (21) into which fits a metal flat bar (10) moving longitudinally inside it. The flat bar passes through a short braking casing piece (30) which has at least one sloping braking surface matching the tapering orifice. The flat bar has a raised flat arm (11) starting at a distance from its attached end and for elastically widening the braking casing piece and for exerting braking force in the orifice of the box-shaped profile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/30; E05F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/30 (2006.01); E05F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 5/00 (2013.01); E05C 17/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937849 A2 19990825; EP 0937849 A3 20000419; DE 19807260 A1 19990909; DE 19807260 C2 20021031

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI