Global Patent Index - EP 0937854 A3

EP 0937854 A3 2000-12-13 - Modular device particularly for automatic doors

Title (en)

Modular device particularly for automatic doors

Title (de)

Modulare Vorrichtung für automatische Türen

Title (fr)

Dispositif modulaire pour portes automatiques

Publication

EP 0937854 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99101784 A

Priority

IT TV980005 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937854A2] A modular device particularly usable for automatic doors, constituted by at least one sensor module (2) which can be associated with the door and can be connected by means of a cable (13) to a management module (15). The management module (15) is adapted to power and detect the number and type of the at least one sensor module (2) and the signal that arrives from it; the signal is processed to transfer it to a suitable actuation unit for moving the door. The separation between the sensor module (2) and the management module (15) allows to considerably reduce costs with respect to the use of conventional motion sensors. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/73 (2013.01); E05F 15/74 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937854 A2 19990825; EP 0937854 A3 20001213; IT 245501 Y1 20020322; IT TV980005 U1 19990818

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI