Global Patent Index - EP 0937886 A3

EP 0937886 A3 2001-04-25 - Method for controlling the power of a vehicle

Title (en)

Method for controlling the power of a vehicle

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Einstellung der Antriebsleistung eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Procédé de réglage de la puissance d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 0937886 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101945 A

Priority

DE 19807126 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937886A2] The method involves defining three operating conditions, whereby in a first condition the optimal torque adjustment results through a load regulation, in a second condition the torque adjustment results as fast as possible through an additional ignition angle adjustment, and in a third working condition the torque setting for the load regulation is fixed, and the remaining torque adjustment results through an additional ignition angle adjustment. The method involves adjusting the drive power of a motor vehicle with an externally ignited combustion engine, having devices for setting a nominal torque on the base of a torque selected by the driver, and, if necessary, further torques, and devices for adjusting this nominal torque through influencing a load and/or an ignition angle. Three operating conditions are, whereby in a first condition the optimal torque adjustment results through a load regulation, in a second condition the torque adjustment results as fast as possible through an additional ignition angle adjustment, and in a third working condition the torque setting for the load regulation is fixed, and the remaining torque adjustment results through an additional ignition angle adjustment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60W 10/04 (2006.01); B60W 10/10 (2006.01); F02D 37/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02P 5/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2013.01); F02D 37/02 (2013.01); F02D 43/00 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1411 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1004 (2013.01); F02D 2250/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937886 A2 19990825; EP 0937886 A3 20010425; EP 0937886 B1 20060104; DE 19807126 A1 19990826; DE 19807126 C2 20001116; DE 59913003 D1 20060330; ES 2255738 T3 20060701; JP H11315746 A 19991116; US 6119654 A 20000919

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-12-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2255738 T3

2006-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913003 P 20060330

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-01-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040330

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI