Global patent index - EP 0937890 A3

EP 0937890 A3 2000-07-26 - Piston for an internal combustion machine

Title (en)

Piston for an internal combustion machine

Title (de)

Hubkolben einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Piston pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0937890 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103226 A

Priority

DE 19807489 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937890A2] The piston has a cavity (3) of such a shape and/or position, that the combustion chamber volume is limited geometrically asymmetrically by the cavity. This limitation is relative to the resonance frequency line of first order, of sound waves, which are generated during mixture ignition. The lines are located in the cylindrical combustion chamber section, point-symmetrical to a central cylinder axis. The cavity base (4) is formed, so that the cavity consists of several segments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/26; F02B 23/06; F02B 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/26 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/26 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937890 A2 19990825; EP 0937890 A3 20000726; DE 19807489 A1 19990826; FR 2775317 A1 19990827; FR 2775317 B1 20020927; IT 1306547 B1 20010618; IT RM990113 A1 20000821

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040319

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030707

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02F 3/26 A, 7F 02B 23/06 B, 7F 02B 23/08 B

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI