Global patent index - EP 0937897 A3

EP 0937897 A3 2000-01-19 - Damping device for a hydraulic actuating system

Title (en)

Damping device for a hydraulic actuating system

Title (de)

Dämpfungsglied für hydraulische Verstelleinrichtungen bei Kraftfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Elément amortisseur pour un dispositif de commande hydraulique

Publication

EP 0937897 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124183 A

Priority

DE 19807446 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937897A2] The damper member (7) consists of at least one disc (4), with at least one first and one second spring plate (5,6). The disc has flow apertures (12) with ends covered by the spring plates. Disc and plate form a pre-assembled unit. The disc is positively connected to the cylinder chamber (8), esp. by ultrasonic welding. The spring plates are fixed by a variable support element, esp. a bimetal or memory element. This thermally variable element alters the valve characteristics when falling below a defined temperature limit, and acts against increasing viscosity of the fluid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 7/08; B60T 8/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 11/10 (2006.01); F15B 7/00 (2006.01); F16D 25/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/008 (2013.01); B60T 11/10 (2013.01); F15B 7/00 (2013.01); F16D 25/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937897 A2 19990825; EP 0937897 A3 20000119; EP 0937897 B1 20041117; DE 19807446 A1 19990902; DE 19807446 B4 20040909; US 6343541 B1 20020205

INPADOC legal status

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59812273

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051222

- Year of fee payment: 08

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061221

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061221

2005-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051222

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-09-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59812273

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20041223

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-11-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2002-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZF SACHS AG

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB SE

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: DAMPING DEVICE FOR A HYDRAULIC ACTUATING SYSTEM

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI