Global patent index - EP 0937944 A3

EP 0937944 A3 2000-01-05 - Combustion method and device for vanadium containing fuels

Title (en)

Combustion method and device for vanadium containing fuels

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verbrennung vanadiumhaltiger Brennstoffe

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de combustion de combustibles contenant du vanadium

Publication

EP 0937944 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103123 A

Priority

DE 19806823 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0937944A2] The burner incorporates a starting burner (3) and inlets (8,30) for a fuel-air mixture and combustion air. A top burner (2) is positioned above the combustion chamber (9) and is in a cover (14) containing at least the starting burner and the inlet for the air and pulverized fuel mixture. The mixture emerges from a nozzle (5) on a secant to the cross-sectional surface of the combustion chamber and is conveyed at an angle of between 35 and 65 degrees to the longitudinal axis (24) of the combustion chamber or coaxially with the starting burner to the combustion chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 5/00; F23C 7/06; F23C 9/08; F23D 1/02; F23J 1/08; F23M 5/00; F23M 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 1/00 (2006.01); F23C 3/00 (2006.01); F23C 5/00 (2006.01); F23C 5/08 (2006.01); F23C 7/06 (2006.01); F23C 9/08 (2006.01); F23C 99/00 (2006.01); F23M 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 5/00 (2013.01); F23C 3/008 (2013.01); F23C 7/06 (2013.01); F23C 9/08 (2013.01); F23M 5/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0937944 A2 19990825; EP 0937944 A3 20000105; EP 0937944 B1 20030528; DE 19806823 A1 19990909; DE 19806823 C2 19991209; ES 2200418 T3 20040301; JP 3477102 B2 20031210; JP H11281008 A 19991015; US 6148745 A 20001121; US 6422160 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

- Free Format Text: TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION#1111 BAGBY STREET#HOUSTON, TX 77002-2543 (US) -TRANSFER TO- TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION#1111 BAGBY STREET#HOUSTON, TX 77002-2543 (US)

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2200418

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

2003-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-07-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59905690

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030703

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORSK HYDRO ASA

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: LOESCHE GMBH

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI