Global Patent Index - EP 0938101 A3

EP 0938101 A3 2000-10-18 - Electrical cord or electrical cable

Title (en)

Electrical cord or electrical cable

Title (de)

Elektrische Leitung oder elektrisches Kabel

Title (fr)

Cordon électrique ou câble électrique

Publication

EP 0938101 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99400234 A

Priority

DE 19807527 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938101A2] The electrical cable has a number of cores (1) each with insulation (2). These are covered by two layers of insulation (3,4) . This is covered with a layer of screening (5) that is in a mesh form of a material with a relatively high permeability such that a high efficiency screening is provided against electromagnetic emissions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 9/02; H01B 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 9/02 (2006.01); H01B 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/1033 (2013.01); H01B 9/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5262591 A 19931116 - ALDISSI MAHMOUD [US]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 03 27 February 1998 (1998-02-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0938101 A2 19990825; EP 0938101 A3 20001018; DE 19807527 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040324

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXANS

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FI FR LI NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FI FR LI NL

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI