Global Patent Index - EP 0938102 A3

EP 0938102 A3 2000-10-18 - High voltage DC power cable

Title (en)

High voltage DC power cable

Title (de)

Hochspannungs-Gleichstromenergiekabel

Title (fr)

Câble d'énergie en courant continu pour haute tension

Publication

EP 0938102 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99400308 A

Priority

NO 980691 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938102A2] The present invention relates to high voltage direct current (HVDC) cables and to subsea installation of such cables. It further relates to a HVDC power cable including a central conductor (1) and insulation layers (2) covered with a metal sheath (3) such as a lead sheath as well as outer armouring (8) and corrosion protection (9). The cable includes a concentrical return current conductor (6) arranged between the metal sheath (3) and the outer corrosion protection layers (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/14 (2006.01); H01B 9/00 (2006.01); H01B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 9/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0938102 A2 19990825; EP 0938102 A3 20001018; EP 0938102 B1 20050914; AU 1740799 A 19990902; AU 755659 B2 20021219; DK 0938102 T3 20060130; JP 4801236 B2 20111026; JP H11273466 A 19991008; NO 310388 B1 20010625; NO 980691 A 19990820; NO 980691 D0 19980219

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-01-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-01-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK GB IT NL SE

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-09-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040122

2001-08-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXANS

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DK GB IT NL SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DK GB IT NL SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI