Global Patent Index - EP 0938106 A4

EP 0938106 A4 2000-11-29 - COIL

Title (en)

COIL

Title (de)

SPULE

Title (fr)

BOBINE

Publication

EP 0938106 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98929707 A

Priority

  • JP 9802867 W
  • JP 18678297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938106A1] The present invention relates to the structure of coils that can be used for transformers and choke coils. The objective of the present invention is to obtain coils that show little iron loss and a small decrease in inductance due to an increase in electric current. The structure is a coil comprising a ring-like core (2) made of amorphous or microcrystalline metal on the surface of which at least one bar core (5) whose length is longer than the inside diameter of the aforesaid ring-like core is placed and fixed as shown in Fig. 1, with the aforesaid bar core wound with an electrically conductive material (6) - particularly a coil comprising at least two ring-like cores (2, 2) between the surfaces of which at least one bar core (3) whose length is longer than the inside diameter of the aforesaid ring-like core is inserted and fixed, with the aforesaid bar core wound with an electrically conductive material (5). Furthermore, the coil of the present invention can be fabricated with great ease compared with the conventional coils with a ring-like core wound with copper wire, such as toroidal coils. The coil of the present invention also shows less iron loss than the conventional coils using cut cores and toroidal cores, and therefore offers the excellent advantages of being able to save energy and showing a small decrease in inductance due to an increase in electric current. Because of this, the coil of the present invention can be utilized for a wide range of applications, such as transformers and choke coils. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 3/10 (2006.01); H01F 5/00 (2006.01); H01F 27/24 (2006.01); H01F 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 37/00 (2013.01); H01F 27/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 2529679 A1 19760129 - ASEA AB
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 284 (E - 217) 17 December 1983 (1983-12-17)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 015 (E - 1305) 12 January 1993 (1993-01-12)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 264 (E - 212) 24 November 1983 (1983-11-24)
  • See also references of WO 9903116A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0938106 A1 19990825; EP 0938106 A4 20001129; CN 1231057 A 19991006; JP H1131613 A 19990202; KR 20000068543 A 20001125; WO 9903116 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010406

2000-11-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990311

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL