Global patent index - EP 0938110 A3

EP 0938110 A3 2000-04-12 - Assembly for switching an electromotor on and off, in particular an electric power tool

Title (en)

Assembly for switching an electromotor on and off, in particular an electric power tool

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für das ein- und ausschalten eines Elektromotors, insbesondere eines Elektrowerkzeugs

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'enclenchement et le déclenchement d'un moteur électrique, notament un outil électrique

Publication

EP 0938110 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124444 A

Priority

DE 29802820 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938110A2] A switching input is used with electrically powered tools and has a pair of fixed contacts (14,16) that are engaged by movable contacts on the ends of carrier arms (19,29). The arms are pivotted at the top (11,12) onto the housing. A push button slide input (18) is displaced and engages studs (21) on arms (22,23) that are pin (26,29) supported. As the arms are displaced the contact carriers operate in sequence.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/64; H01H 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/22 (2006.01); H01H 13/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/22 (2013.01); H01H 13/64 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802820 U1 19980416; EP 0938110 A2 19990825; EP 0938110 A3 20000412; US 6046419 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050721

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI