Global patent index - EP 0938155 A3

EP 0938155 A3 2000-09-20 - Method and device for calibration of an antenna array

Title (en)

Method and device for calibration of an antenna array

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kalibrieren einer Gruppenantenne

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil d'étalonnage d'un réseau d'antennes

Publication

EP 0938155 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123105 A

Priority

DE 19806914 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5940032A] A method and apparatus for calibrating transmission and reception paths of a group antenna with an adaptive radiation pattern is provided, in which one transmission signal after the other is transmitted over each transmission path (DA1, . . . ,DAN; Tx1, . . . ,TxN; DP1, . . . ,DPN), a signal portion is decoupled from each transmission signal and the decoupled portion of at least one transmission signal is divided into as many equal parts of equal strength and equal phase as reception paths present. These equal parts of the decoupled transmission signal portion are coupled into the respective reception paths and the strengths and phases of the equal parts transmitted over the respective reception paths (DP1, . . . ,DPN; Rx1, . . . ,RxN; AD1, . . . ,ADN) are measured. The transmission factors of all other ones transmission paths and reception paths are determined from known transmission factor values for them and the measured strengths and phases of the equal parts of the at least one transmission path. Deviations of the resulting transmission factors are compensated by changing weighting factors of a radiation pattern network (Tx-BFN, Rx-BFN).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/267 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0938155 A2 19990825; EP 0938155 A3 20000920; DE 19806914 A1 19990909; DE 19806914 C2 20020131; US 5940032 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040816

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI