Global patent index - EP 0938158 A3

EP 0938158 A3 2000-11-02 - Antenna

Title (en)

Antenna

Title (de)

Antenne

Title (fr)

Antenne

Publication

EP 0938158 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99660027 A

Priority

  • FI 980392 A
  • US 25215999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938158A2] The invention comprises an antenna structure particularly suited for mobile stations. The antenna comprises a radiating element (100) which is of a conductor form. The antenna conductor comprises a basic conductor and as an extension to this a conductor (115, 116) which at least partly is located relatively close to the basic conductor. As the conductors are close to each other that causes an electromagnetic coupling, which again causes a second resonance frequency for the antenna. The bandwidth of the antenna can be widened when the second resonance frequency is arranged close to the first one. The antenna can be made as a two-band antenna when the second resonance frequency is arranged relatively far from the first one. The bands can be made relatively wide, so that the antenna operates satisfactorily in different positions and in the neighbourhood of objects. It can be fastened to the back wall of a mobile station, whereby the distance to the user's head is made as large as possible. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/42; H01Q 1/24; H01Q 1/36; H01Q 5/00; H01Q 11/04; H01Q 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/36 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 9/42 (2006.01); H01Q 11/04 (2006.01); H01Q 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 11/14 (2013.01); H01Q 1/242 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 1/36 (2013.01); H01Q 5/357 (2013.01); H01Q 9/42 (2013.01); H01Q 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5363114 A 19941108 - SHOEMAKER KEVIN O [US]
  • [X] US 2647211 A 19530728 - SMEBY LYNNE C
  • [X] EP 0814536 A2 19971229 - YOKOWO SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]
  • [A] US 5526007 A 19960611 - MURAKAMI YUICHI [JP], et al
  • [A] US 5289198 A 19940222 - ALTSHULER EDWARD E [US]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 264 (E - 1370) 24 May 1993 (1993-05-24)
  • [A] ROEDERER A G: "THE CROSS ANTENNA: A NEW LOW-PROFILE CIRCULARLY POLARIZED RADIATOR", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 38, no. 5, 1 May 1990 (1990-05-01), pages 704 - 710, XP000135617, ISSN: 0018-926X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0938158 A2 19990825; EP 0938158 A3 20001102; FI 980392 A0 19980220; FI 980392 A 19990821

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01Q 9/42 A, 7H 01Q 5/00 B, 7H 01Q 1/36 B, 7H 01Q 1/24 B, 7H 01Q 11/04 B, 7H 01Q 11/14 B

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI