Global patent index - EP 0938299 A4

EP 0938299 A4 2001-01-17 - METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PROTEIN PARTICLES USEFUL FOR DELIVERY OF PHARMACOLOGICAL AGENTS

Title (en)

METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PROTEIN PARTICLES USEFUL FOR DELIVERY OF PHARMACOLOGICAL AGENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PROTEINPARTIKELN ZUR VERABREICHUNG PHARMAKOLOGISCHER STOFFE

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION DE PARTICULES DE PROTEINES UTILES DANS LA DIFFUSION D'AGENTS PHARMACOLOGIQUES

Publication

EP 0938299 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97936517 A

Priority

  • US 9714661 W
  • US 2396896 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9807410A1] A method has been developed for the formation of submicron particles (nanoparticles) by heat-denaturation of proteins (such as human serum albumin) in the presence of multivalent ions (such as calcium). Also provided are novel products produced by the invention method. An appropriate concentration of multivalent ions, within a relatively narrow range of concentrations, induces the precipitation of protein in the form of colloidal particles, at a temperature which is well below the heat denaturation temperature of the protein (as low as 60 DEG C for serum albumin). Temperatures at which invention method operates are sufficiently low to permit incorporation of other molecules (e.g., by co-precipitation), into submicron particles according to the invention, including compounds which cannot withstand high temperatures. Invention methods facilitate the production of protein nanoparticles and microparticles containing various molecules (such as nucleic acids, oligonucleotides, polynucleotides, DNA, RNA, polysaccharides, ribozymes, pharmacologically active compounds, and the like) useful for therapeutic, diagnostic and other purposes. The addition of multivalent cations serves both to induce precipitation, and to allow linking of negatively charged molecules, such as DNA, to the negatively charged protein.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/50; A61K 47/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/16 (2006.01); A61K 9/51 (2006.01); A61K 49/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/5169 (2013.01); A61K 9/1658 (2013.01); A61K 9/5192 (2013.01); A61K 49/223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9217213 A1 19921015 - NYCOMED AS [NO], et al
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Week 8218, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 1982-36391E, XP002154304
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Week 896, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 1996-072972, XP002152530
  • See also references of WO 9807410A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9807410 A1 19980226; AU 3916997 A 19980306; CA 2263765 A1 19980226; CA 2263765 C 20100330; EP 0938299 A1 19990901; EP 0938299 A4 20010117

INPADOC legal status

2006-06-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20060504

2004-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMERICAN BIOSCIENCE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030423

2001-01-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 9/50 A, 7A 61K 47/42 B

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990301

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE