Global Patent Index - EP 0938317 A4

EP 0938317 A4 2000-08-23 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING RESPIRATORY DEPRESSION

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING RESPIRATORY DEPRESSION

Title (de)

ZUSAMMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON ATMUNGSDEPRESSIONEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE REDUCTION DE LA DEPRESSION RESPIRATOIRE

Publication

EP 0938317 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97925749 A

Priority

  • US 9709123 W
  • US 65872696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9746240A1] The present invention relates to diarylmethyl piperazine compounds and diarylmethyl piperidine compounds, and pharmaceutical compositions thereof, having utility in medical therapy especially for reducing respiratory depression associated with certain analgesics, such as mu opiates. This invention additionally relates to diarylmethyl piperazine compounds and diarylmethyl piperidine compounds having utility in assays for determining the respiratory reducing characteristics of other bioactive compounds, including other diarylmethyl piperazine compounds and other diarylmethyl piperidine compounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/495; A61K 31/445; C07D 211/10; C07D 241/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); C07D 295/096 (2006.01); C07D 295/155 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/096 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/495 (2013.01); A61K 31/496 (2013.01); C07D 295/155 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9746240 A1 19971211; AT 260658 T 20040315; AU 3079897 A 19980105; AU 714472 B2 20000106; CA 2257393 A1 19971211; CA 2257393 C 20100824; DE 69727956 D1 20040408; EP 0938317 A1 19990901; EP 0938317 A4 20000823; EP 0938317 B1 20040303; US 5807858 A 19980915

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2005-03-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-02-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-06-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-06-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-06-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-06-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69727956 P 20040408

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/496 A

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/495 B

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/445 B

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 241/04 B

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 211/10 B

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/38 B

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/54 B

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 11/16 B

2003-10-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCING RESPIRATORY DEPRESSION

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/496 A

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/495 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/445 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 241/04 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 211/10 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/38 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/54 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 11/16 B

2003-09-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCING RESPIRATORY DEPRESSION

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARDENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/495 A, 7A 61K 31/445 B, 7C 07D 241/04 B, 7C 07D 211/10 B, 7A 61K 31/38 B, 7A 61K 31/54 B

2000-08-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981202

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE