Global Patent Index - EP 0938375 B1

EP 0938375 B1 2000-06-07 - FE- AND AL-CONTAINING SYNTHETIC POLYSILICIC ACID (SILICA) FOR REFINING OILS

Title (en)

FE- AND AL-CONTAINING SYNTHETIC POLYSILICIC ACID (SILICA) FOR REFINING OILS

Title (de)

FE- UND AL-HALTIGE SYNTHETISCHE POLYKIESELSÄURE (SILICA) ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ÖLEN

Title (fr)

ACIDE POLYSILICIQUE (SILICE) SYNTHETIQUE CONTENANT DU FER ET DE L'ALUMINIUM POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES HUILES

Publication

EP 0938375 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97943828 A

Priority

  • DE 19635730 A
  • EP 9704782 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19635730A1] A synthetic polysilicic acid (silica) which contains the oxides of at least two metals with a valency of at least 2, of which one is iron and the other aluminium, and which is used to refine oils, is characterised in that the proportion of iron and aluminium is less than 15 % by moles (relative to the sum of said metals and silicium), in that its specific surface is higher than 100 m<2>/g and in that its water content (determined after drying at 105 DEG C as loss on ignition at 1000 DEG C) is lower than about 5 wt %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 20/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 20/10 (2006.01); C01B 33/12 (2006.01); C11B 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11B 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19635730 A1 19980305; EP 0938375 A1 19990901; EP 0938375 B1 20000607; JP 2000517241 A 20001226; JP 3996199 B2 20071024; WO 9809723 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090902

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090902

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SUD-CHEMIE A.G.

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090916

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080815

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701863 20000713

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991021

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981028

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL