Global Patent Index - EP 0938380 B1

EP 0938380 B1 2001-03-28 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING STRUCTURED SHEET METAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING STRUCTURED SHEET METAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN STRUKTURIERTER METALLBLECHE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE DES TOLES METALLIQUES STRUCTUREES

Publication

EP 0938380 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97944888 A

Priority

  • DE 19643934 A
  • EP 9705097 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19643934A1] The invention relates to a method and a device to produce structured sheet metal. According to the inventive method, a strip of sheet metal (6) initially undergoes a structuring operation wherein a structure (8) is formed, whose structural height (H) is greater than a theoretical structural height (SH), followed by a calibration operation in a calibration unit (9). The structure (8) is guided through two rollers (10, 11) of the calibration unit (9) whereby the height of the structure once it has passed through the calibration unit (9) corresponds to the theoretical structural height (SH).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23D 23/00 (2006.01); B01J 35/04 (2006.01); B21D 13/04 (2006.01); B21D 47/00 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 35/04 (2013.01); F01N 3/281 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0460611 A1 19911211 - NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19643934 A1 19980507; AU 4623797 A 19980522; CN 1111449 C 20030618; CN 1235563 A 19991117; DE 59703249 D1 20010503; EP 0938380 A1 19990901; EP 0938380 B1 20010328; JP 2000505000 A 20000425; JP 3544674 B2 20040721; KR 100476119 B1 20050315; KR 20000052906 A 20000825; MY 122364 A 20060429; US 6286353 B1 20010911; WO 9818557 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59703249

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120917

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120917

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120917

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703249

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-03

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991007

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT