Global Patent Index - EP 0938419 B1

EP 0938419 B1 2000-11-15 - THERMO-SENSITIVE PRINTING SHEET COMPRISING A BACK COATING CONTAINING STARCH, AN ACRYLATE COPOLYMER AND AN ALKALINE CATALYST

Title (en)

THERMO-SENSITIVE PRINTING SHEET COMPRISING A BACK COATING CONTAINING STARCH, AN ACRYLATE COPOLYMER AND AN ALKALINE CATALYST

Title (de)

WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHER AUFZEICHNUNGSBOGEN MIT EINER RÜCKSEITENBESCHICHTUNG DIE STÄRKE, EIN ACRYLATCOPOLYMER UND EINEN ALKALISCHEN KATALYSATOR ENTHÄLT

Title (fr)

FEUILLE D'IMPRESSION THERMOSENSIBLE MUNIE D'UN REVETEMENT AU VERSO, CONTENANT DE L'AMIDON, UN COPOLYMERE D'ACRYLATE ET UN CATALYSEUR ALCALIN

Publication

EP 0938419 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946412 A

Priority

  • DE 19740072 A
  • DE 19748258 A
  • EP 9805347 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914056A1] The present invention relates to a thermo-sensitive printing sheet having a thermo-sensitive printing layer that contains chromogenic substances as well as chromo-acceptors. The surface opposed to the printing layer comprises a back coating of a mixture containing the following elements: starch, an acrylate copolymer which is free from styrene or vinylacetate components and has a film-forming temperature lower than 5 DEG C, and an alkaline catalyst.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/40; G09F 3/02; G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/28 (2006.01); B41M 5/30 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/42 (2006.01); B41M 5/44 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/42 (2013.01); B41M 5/44 (2013.01); G09F 3/02 (2013.01); G09F 3/10 (2013.01); B41M 2205/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914056 A1 19990325; AT 197574 T 20001215; EP 0938419 A1 19990901; EP 0938419 B1 20001115; ES 2153707 T3 20010301; JP 2001505150 A 20010417; US 6326330 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110822

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800342

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110822

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100823

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100822

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100822

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090828

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090812

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI HITEC PAPER FLENSBURG G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20010831

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-08-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153707 T3

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-02-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010215

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800342 20001221

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-11-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197574 T 20001215

2000-09-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-02-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI HITEC PAPER FLENSBURG GMBH

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990403

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE