Global Patent Index - EP 0938436 B1

EP 0938436 B1 2001-01-10 - DEVICE FOR THE HEAT-INSULATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE STABILITY OF CONTAINERS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR THE HEAT-INSULATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE STABILITY OF CONTAINERS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM THERMOISOLIEREN UND ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER STANDFESTIGKEIT VON BEHÄLTERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ASSURER L'ISOLATION THERMIQUE ET AMELIORER LA STABILITE DE RECIPIENTS

Publication

EP 0938436 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97935521 A

Priority

  • DE 29619616 U
  • EP 9703758 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9821123A1] The invention concerns a device for the partial or complete heat-insulation of containers with their contents, the device comprising an insulating part (1) which holds a container and has an outer side (2) to which a printable plastics foil is applied such that it adheres with a firm hold. The outer side (2) of the insulating part (1) is cylindrical or barrel-shaped and is closed at one or both ends by a base (5) and/or a lid (6). The cylindrical or barrel-shaped part and the base and the cylindrical or barrel-shaped part and the lid are produced in one part, and the insulating part is shaped inwardly so that it matches the container, the cylindrical or barrel-shaped outer sides (2) running parallel to the longitudinal axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3879 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29619616 U1 19970320; AT 198580 T 20010115; AU 3848597 A 19980603; EP 0938436 A1 19990901; EP 0938436 B1 20010110; WO 9821123 A1 19980522

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2003-08-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030820

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-02-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FLIEGER HELMUT

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010714

2001-07-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010714

2001-07-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-06-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-04-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010413

2001-04-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702911 20010215

2001-02-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2001-01-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198580 T 20010115

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990924

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990426

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT