Global Patent Index - EP 0938602 B1

EP 0938602 B1 2002-11-27 - STITCHBONDED FABRIC

Title (en)

STITCHBONDED FABRIC

Title (de)

GESTICKTER VLIESSTOFF

Title (fr)

TISSU DE COUTURE-TRICOTAGE

Publication

EP 0938602 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98947043 A

Priority

  • US 9819238 W
  • US 93101797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5879779A] An improved stitchbonded nonwoven fabric having repeating patterns of stitches in a fibrous layer is prepared with a stitching thread that consists essentially of fiber of partially molecularly oriented synthetic organic polymer. The fabric can be stretched, shrunken, and/or heat set and is particularly suited for thermoforming operations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/52; D04H 13/00; B32B 7/08; B32B 3/06; D06N 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/45 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01); D06N 3/00 (2006.01); D06N 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06N 3/14 (2013.01); D04H 1/52 (2013.01); D06N 3/0002 (2013.01); Y10T 428/23979 (2015.04); Y10T 428/24033 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24331 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24438 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24446 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24521 (2013.01); Y10T 428/258 (2013.01); Y10T 442/2861 (2015.04); Y10T 442/682 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5879779 A 19990309; AU 9392098 A 19990405; CA 2271964 A1 19990325; CA 2271964 C 20070213; DE 69809707 D1 20030109; DE 69809707 T2 20030821; EP 0938602 A1 19990901; EP 0938602 B1 20021127; JP 2001505631 A 20010424; TW 403798 B 20000901; WO 9914414 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809707

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120914

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120914

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120914

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110913

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809707 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-06-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STITCHBONDED FABRIC

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XYMID L.L.C.

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990527

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT