Global Patent Index - EP 0938758 B1

EP 0938758 B1 2001-01-24 - ELECTRICAL CONTACT

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CONTACT

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER

Title (fr)

CONTACT ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0938758 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97948230 A

Priority

  • JP 31546996 A
  • US 9720497 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9821784A1] An electrical contact in which a latch member protective section protects a flexible latch member and prevents reverse insertion of the electrical contact into a connector housing, and that is equipped with an anti-overstress member that prevents overstress in the flexible latch member. The electrical contact (1) is equipped with a latching section (20) that has a flexible latch member (25) that latches the contact to a connector housing. The latching section is equipped with a latch member protective section (21) comprising outside wall portion (21a), that is raised upward from a side wall (22), and whose upper end protrudes upward beyond the free end of the flexible latch member (25), and an inside wall portion (21b), that is folded downward from an upper end of the outside wall portion (21a), and an anti-overstress member (24), that is bent toward another side wall (23) from the inside wall portion (21b), so that the anti-overstress member (24) can be engaged by the flexible latch member (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/432

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/428 (2006.01); H01R 13/432 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/432 (2013.01); H01R 13/113 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9821784 A1 19980522; AU 5433498 A 19980603; CN 1104754 C 20030402; CN 1237280 A 19991201; DE 69703989 D1 20010301; DE 69703989 T2 20010613; EP 0938758 A1 19990901; EP 0938758 B1 20010124; JP 3221557 B2 20011022; JP H10144378 A 19980529

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011105

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011004

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703989

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-01

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000302

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990601

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB