Global patent index - EP 0938860 A3

EP 0938860 A3 2000-05-24 - Shower tray and shower booth

Title (en)

Shower tray and shower booth

Title (de)

Duschwanne und Duschkabine

Title (fr)

Bac de douche et cabine de douche

Publication

EP 0938860 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103244 A

Priority

DE 29803092 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938860A2] At least one bearing (12,14) is integrated into the side wall and/or the floor (36) of the shower tub. Preferably the bearing is formed by a bush housed in a cavity integrally formed from the wall or floor. The side wall has a relatively thick section (50) for housing the bearing, which creates a raised profile sloping downwards away from the cavity. At least two bearings are used to mount a pair of swing doors, whose journals are housed inside the cavities and/or to mount fixed cubicle wall panels in the tub side wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01); A47K 3/40 (2006.01); E05D 7/082 (2006.01); E05D 7/083 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2013.01); A47K 3/40 (2013.01); E05D 7/083 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29803092 U1 19980423; EP 0938860 A2 19990901; EP 0938860 A3 20000524

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040525

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020314

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47K 3/36 A

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI